NH HB1591 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 232-98 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 97
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 232-98 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 97
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a private right of action for toxin exposure.
Title
Relative to a private right of action for toxin exposure.
Sponsors
Rep. Mindi Messmer [D] | Rep. James McConnell [R] | Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Valerie Fraser [R] |
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - ITL (Y: 232 N: 98 NV: 30 Abs: 31) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 232-98 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 97 |
2018-02-27 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-02-27 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 10-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 43 |
2018-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 208 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 16 |