NH HB1592 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: No Recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: No Recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to requiring prevailing wages on state-funded public works projects.
Title
Relative to requiring prevailing wages on state-funded public works projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | House | Interim Study Report: No Recommendation |
2014-09-17 | House | Executive Session: 10/14/2014 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2014-09-17 | House | Interim Study - Full Committee Work Session: 10/14/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2014-09-03 | House | Interim Study - Full Committee Work Session: 9/17/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2014-02-19 | House | Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Feb 19 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 11 |
2014-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/11/2014 2:45 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2014-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 1/28/2014 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-12-17 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services |