NH HB1595 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/21/2018; Chapter 281; Eff. 1/1/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the use of the left lane of a multilane roadway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the use of the left lane of a multilane roadway.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/21/2018; Chapter 281; Eff. 1/1/2019
2018-05-29SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-29HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-05-10HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1714s (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018
2018-05-02SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1714s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-05-02SenateSen. Birdsell Floor Amendment # 2018-1714s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-04-26SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19
2018-04-26SenateSpecial Order to 05/02/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/26/2018 Senate Journal 14
2018-04-26SenateSen. Birdsell Moved to Remove HB 1595 from the Consent Calendar; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
2018-04-18SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/26/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 18
2018-04-11SenateHearing: 04/17/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 17
2018-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-06HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0579h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 57
2018-03-06HouseAmendment # 2018-0579h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 57
2018-02-23HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0579h (NT) for 03/06/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 33
2018-02-21HouseExecutive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 203
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/16/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203
2017-11-13HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 16

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback