NH HB1596 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 15-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 15-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing for an adjustment to business enterprise taxes for business funds acquired by loan from a financial institution.
Title
Allowing for an adjustment to business enterprise taxes for business funds acquired by loan from a financial institution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | House | Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 15-0) |
2014-09-17 | House | Executive Session: 9/17/2014 Legislative Office Building 202 2 Hours after Session (Announced on Floor) |
2014-09-15 | House | Interim Study - Full Committee Work Session: 9/17/2014 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-08-25 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 8/27/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-08-14 | House | Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/27/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-02-06 | House | Refer to Interim Study Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Feb 5 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 7 |
2014-01-16 | House | Executive Session: 1/23/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-01-08 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 1/16/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/16/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-12-17 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Ways and Means |