NH HB1599 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-02 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a special marriage officiant license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a special marriage officiant license.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-02HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2020-06-02HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 12
2020-05-07HouseExecutive Session: 05/12/2020 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link: https://zoom.us/j/91719044913
2020-03-11House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/17/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2020-03-04HouseFull Committee Work Session: 03/09/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2020-02-26House==TIME CHANGE== Full Committee Work Session: 03/05/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2020-02-26HousePublic Hearing: 03/04/2020 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2020-02-19HouseReferred to Ways and Means 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 67
2020-02-19HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 196-146 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 67
2020-02-06HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2020-02-06HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/19/2020 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 23
2020-01-15HouseExecutive Session: 02/05/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2020-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/22/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 208
2019-12-04HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 28

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback