NH HB1603 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 14-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 14-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to renewal of emergency medical technician-intermediate licenses.
Title
Relative to renewal of emergency medical technician-intermediate licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | House | Interim Study Report: Not Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 14-0) |
2014-10-01 | House | Executive Session: 10/21/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2014-10-01 | House | Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/21/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2014-10-01 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 10/23/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2014-08-20 | House | Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/23/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2014-07-10 | House | Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/20/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2014-03-19 | House | Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study (Vote 10-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 19 |
2014-02-26 | House | Continued Executive Session: 3/4/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2014-02-18 | House | ===CONTINUED=== Executive Session: 2/20/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 ===RECESSED=== |
2014-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 2/18/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 ===RECESSED=== |
2014-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 1/28/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-12-17 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration |