NH HB1603 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to employee representation on the independent investment committee in the New Hampshire retirement system.
Title
Relative to employee representation on the independent investment committee in the New Hampshire retirement system.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Proulx [R] | Rep. Dianne Schuett [D] | Rep. Herbert Richardson [R] | Rep. David Danielson [R] |
Rep. Michael McCarthy [R] | Rep. Martin Bove [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Hearing: 04/25/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0381h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 38 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0381h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 38 |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0381h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 21 |
2018-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-06 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/12/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-05 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/08/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 17 |