NH HB1607 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to liability for wrongful acts in an employer/employee relationship.
Title
Relative to liability for wrongful acts in an employer/employee relationship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 222 |
2020-03-11 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Radhakrishnan) 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 2 |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 22 |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 03/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 28 |