NH HB161 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the use of false or deceptive caller identification information.
Title
Prohibiting the use of false or deceptive caller identification information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 2 |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 2 |
2019-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-24 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 39 |