NH HB1613 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 169
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 169
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing prisoners serving life sentences to be eligible for parole after 25 years.
Title
Allowing prisoners serving life sentences to be eligible for parole after 25 years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 169 |
2020-03-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2020-03-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 15-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 44 |
2020-02-19 | House | Executive Session: 02/25/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2020-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/12/2020 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2020-01-21 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/12/2020 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 28 |