NH HB1618 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 54
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 54
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to ambient water quality standards and maximum contaminant levels for perfluorinated chemicals.
Title
Relative to ambient water quality standards and maximum contaminant levels for perfluorinated chemicals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 54 |
2018-02-21 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 30 |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2018 Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 1 P. 17 |