NH HB1619 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to organ transplants.
Title
Relative to organ transplants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 35 |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 20 |
2020-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 02/18/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 29 |