NH HB1623 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 82; Eff. 7/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 82; Eff. 7/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to criteria for debarment of vendors.
Title
Relative to criteria for debarment of vendors.
Sponsors
Rep. Jacalyn Cilley [D] | Rep. Kate Murray [D] | Rep. Douglas Ley [D] | Rep. David Lisle [D] |
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 82; Eff. 7/24/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Hearing: 04/11/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0812h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 39 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0812h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 39 |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0812h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 15-3; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 22 |
2018-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-21 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/26/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2018 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 17 |