NH HB1628 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Senate Sen. Houde Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 18, Pg.479
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Senate Sen. Houde Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 18, Pg.479
Summary
Establishing guidelines for neighborhood notification upon release of a sexual offender.
Title
Establishing guidelines for neighborhood notification upon release of a sexual offender.
Sponsors
Sen. David Boutin [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Robert Letourneau [R] | Rep. Leo Pepino [R] |
Rep. Pamela Price [R] | Sen. Sheila Roberge [R] | Rep. Mary Walz [D] | Rep. David Welch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Senate Sen. Houde Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 18, Pg.479 | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Refer to Interim Study Not Voted On | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 5/12/10; Senate Calendar 19 | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Hearing: April 20, 2010, Room 103, State House, 2:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 11, Pg.264 | |
2010-03-10 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Division Vote 318-21; House Journal 23, PG.1260 | |
2010-03-03 | House Special Ordered to Next Session Without Objection; House Journal 20, PG.1180 | |
2010-02-09 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 3 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 17, PG.819 | |
2010-02-03 | House Executive Session: 2/9/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2010-01-12 | House Public Hearing: 1/26/2010 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 6, PG.246 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2378&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |