NH HB1628 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Div 238-54
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Div 238-54
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to games of chance and establishing a gaming regulatory commission and video lottery gaming.
Title
Relative to games of chance and establishing a gaming regulatory commission and video lottery gaming.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Div 238-54 |
2014-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 16-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 14 |
2014-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 3/4/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-02-04 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/7/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/6/2014 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2013-12-27 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Ways and Means |