NH HB1628 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to number plates for motor vehicles.
Title
Relative to number plates for motor vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 40 |
2018-02-09 | House | Special Order to 2/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 3 P. 81 |
2018-01-24 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/07/2018 (Vote 11-4; Regular Calendar) |
2018-01-24 | House | Executive Session: 01/23/2018 Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 02:45 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 18 |