NH HB1637 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring school districts to establish policies relating to suspensions and expulsions.
Title
Requiring school districts to establish policies relating to suspensions and expulsions.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gile [D] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-11 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/16/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Reagan, Ward, Watters; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Reagan Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Ladd, T. Wolf, V. Sullivan, Doherty 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1458s and Requests CofC (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1458s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1458s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1458s, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/27/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:10 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 8 |
2018-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/22/2018 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 7 |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 18 |