NH HB1638 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 22-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the administration of the SNAP incentive programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the administration of the SNAP incentive programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-01HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 22-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 4
2020-05-14HouseExecutive Session: 05/21/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: https://www.zoom.us/j/91769986281
2020-03-04House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/18/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211
2020-02-24HouseDivison III Work Session: 03/04/2020 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211
2020-02-19HouseReferred to Finance 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 62
2020-02-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0131h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 62
2020-02-19HouseAmendment # 2020-0131h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 62
2020-02-12HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0131h for 02/19/2020 (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 22
2020-01-29HouseExecutive Session: 02/04/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2020-01-29HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2020-01-15HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/22/2020 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2020-01-08HousePublic Hearing: 01/15/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-12-12HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 29

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback