NH HB1639 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-30 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/29/2020; Chapter 39; I. Sec. 1/ 20-22 & 24 Eff: 06/30/2021 II. Sec. 7/ 8/ 23 & 25 Eff: 01/01/2021 at 12:04 am III. Sec 14/ 26-47/ 49 & 61-63 Eff: 01/01/2021 IV. Sec 9-12/ 50-54 & 59 Eff: 09/27/2020 V. Sec 55-57/ 64-67 & 69 Eff: 07/01/2020 VI. Sec 5/ 60 & 58 Eff: 07/01/2021 VII. Rem. Eff: 07/29/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to health care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to health care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-01 - House - Concur (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 351 Abs: 38) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-30HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/29/2020; Chapter 39; I. Sec. 1/ 20-22 & 24 Eff: 06/30/2021 II. Sec. 7/ 8/ 23 & 25 Eff: 01/01/2021 at 12:04 am III. Sec 14/ 26-47/ 49 & 61-63 Eff: 01/01/2021 IV. Sec 9-12/ 50-54 & 59 Eff: 09/27/2020 V. Sec 55-57/ 64-67 & 69 Eff: 07/01/2020 VI. Sec 5/ 60 & 58 Eff: 07/01/2021 VII. Rem. Eff: 07/29/2020
2020-07-16SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9
2020-07-16HouseEnrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10
2020-07-14HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2020-1633eba: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020
2020-07-13SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2020-1633e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9
2020-06-30HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 201-121 06/30/2020
2020-06-16SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2020-1435s and 2020-1513s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-16SenateSen. Sherman Floor Amendment # 2020-1513s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-16SenateCommittee Amendment # 2020-1435s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-12SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1435s, 06/16/2020; Senate Calendar 23
2020-06-05SenateThe following email will be monitored throughout the meeting by someone who can assist with and alert the committee to any technical issues: remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us or call (603-271-3043). Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate6. To view/listen to this hearing on YouTube, use this link: https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCjBZdtrjRnQdmg-2MPMiWrA Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate5. Webinar ID: 997 1560 0870 Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate4. Or iPhone one-tap: 9292056099,,99715600870# or 13017158592,,99715600870# Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate3. To listen via telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): 1-301-715-8592, or 1-312-626-6799 or 1-929-205-6099, or 1-253-215-8782, or 1-346-248-7799, or 1-669-900-6833 Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate2. To submit your testimony to the committee, please send all documents via email to remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate1. To sign-in and/or speak in support or opposition, please register in advance by using this link: https://www.zoom.us/webinar/register/WN_DhzI7U5vQRi3zvou0MN6ow Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateMembers of the public may attend using the following links: Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateCommittee members will receive secure Zoom invitations via email. Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateRemote Hearing: 06/10/2020, 08:40 am, on proposed amendment # 2020-1386s; Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateRemote Hearing: 06/10/2020, 08:35 am; Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateIntroduced 03/12/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 8
2020-03-11HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0956h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 37
2020-03-11HouseAmendment # 2020-0956h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 37
2020-03-04HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0956h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 21
2020-02-25HouseExecutive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2020-02-05HousePublic Hearing: 02/13/2020 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 205
2020-01-29House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/06/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-12-12HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 29

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback