NH HB1641 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reducing the criminal penalty for certain controlled drugs.
Title
Reducing the criminal penalty for certain controlled drugs.
Sponsors
Rep. Casey Conley [D] | Rep. Amanda Bouldin [D] | Rep. Andrew Bouldin [D] | Rep. Skip Cleaver [D] |
Rep. Andrew Prout [R] | Rep. Josh Yokela [R] | Rep. Nicole Klein-Knight [D] | Rep. Charlie St. Clair [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/17/2020, Room 100, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0402h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 5 |
2020-02-19 | House | Amendment # 2020-0402h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 5 |
2020-02-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0402h for 02/19/2020 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 4 |
2020-01-30 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/05/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2020-01-29 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/05/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2020-01-09 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/28/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-12-12 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 29 |