NH HB1642 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-02 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1255h
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-02 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1255h
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the state or a state official from using a face recognition system.
Title
Prohibiting the state or a state official from using a face recognition system.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Hopper [R] | Rep. John Burt [R] | Rep. Gerald Ward [D] | Rep. Mark Warden [R] |
Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. David Welch [R] | Rep. Casey Conley [D] | Rep. Max Abramson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1255h |
2020-06-02 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 10 |
2020-05-21 | House | Executive Session: 05/28/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using link: https://www.zoom.us/j/93753528854 |
2020-05-14 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/19/2020 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link: https://zoom.us/j/96189996540 |
2020-03-03 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/18/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2020-03-03 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 03/17/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 57 |
2020-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0622h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 57 |
2020-02-19 | House | Amendment # 2020-0622h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 57 |
2020-02-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0622h (NT) for 02/19/2020 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 21 |
2020-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/12/2020 09:55 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2020-02-07 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/10/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2020-01-09 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 01/23/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2019-12-12 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 30 |