NH HB1645 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to forwarding addresses of tenants in landlord tenant actions.
Title
Relative to forwarding addresses of tenants in landlord tenant actions.
Sponsors
Rep. John Janigian [R] | Rep. Brian Chirichiello [R] | Rep. Richard Hinch [R] | Rep. Douglas Thomas [R] |
Rep. Betty Gay [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 48 |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 26 |
2018-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 208 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 18 |