NH HB1645 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/16/2020; Chapter 12; I. Sec. 16-19 Eff: 01/01/2021 II. Sec. 1/4-6/15 and 20-23 Eff: 09/14/2020 III. Rem. Eff: 07/16/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/16/2020; Chapter 12; I. Sec. 16-19 Eff: 01/01/2021 II. Sec. 1/4-6/15 and 20-23 Eff: 09/14/2020 III. Rem. Eff: 07/16/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to superior court judgments; adding a bail commissioner to the commission on pretrial detention, pretrial scheduling, and pretrial services and the release of a defendant pending trial; prison privatization; misdemeanor domestic violence offenses; immunity from arrest or prosecution for certain alcoholic beverage violations; police officers reporting misconduct; criminal mischief; screening for all law enforcement officers for psychological stability prior to assuming their duties as certified officers; and prohibiting the use of chokeholds by law enforcement officers.
Title
Relative to superior court judgments; adding a bail commissioner to the commission on pretrial detention, pretrial scheduling, and pretrial services and the release of a defendant pending trial; prison privatization; misdemeanor domestic violence offenses; immunity from arrest or prosecution for certain alcoholic beverage violations; police officers reporting misconduct; criminal mischief; screening for all law enforcement officers for psychological stability prior to assuming their duties as certified officers; and prohibiting the use of chokeholds by law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-01 - House - Concur (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 346 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/16/2020; Chapter 12; I. Sec. 16-19 Eff: 01/01/2021 II. Sec. 1/4-6/15 and 20-23 Eff: 09/14/2020 III. Rem. Eff: 07/16/2020 |
2020-07-10 | House | Enrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 71 |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9 |
2020-06-30 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Cushing): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 255-74 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 24 |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Sen. Hennessey Floor Amendment # 2020-1525s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1492s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-1492s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1492s, 06/16/2020; Senate Calendar 23 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | The following email will be monitored throughout the meeting by someone who can assist with and alert the committee to any technical issues: remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us or call (603-271-3043). Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 6. To view/listen to this hearing on YouTube, use this link: https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCjBZdtrjRnQdmg-2MPMiWrA Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 5. Webinar ID: 921 4734 0764 Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 4. Or iPhone one-tap: 13126266799,,92147340764# or 19292056099,,92147340764# Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 3. To listen via telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): 1-301-715-8592, or 1-312-626-6799 or 1-929-205-6099, or 1-253-215-8782, or 1-346-248-7799, or 1-669-900-6833 Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 2. To submit your testimony to the committee, please send all documents via email to remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 1. To sign-in and/or speak in support or opposition, please register in advance by using this link: https://www.zoom.us/webinar/register/WN_06XzVPTbTGKeSq6WjiSJbw Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Members of the public may attend using the following links: Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Committee members will receive secure Zoom invitations via email. Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 06/12/2020, 01:40 pm, on proposed amendment # 2020-1380s; Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 06/12/2020, 01:35 pm; Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Introduced 03/12/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 169 |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 44 |
2020-02-26 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 (if necessary) |
2020-02-19 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2020-02-19 | House | Public Hearing: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-12-12 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 30 |