NH HB1646 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to historic racing.
Title
Relative to historic racing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - House - Table (Y: 155 N: 121 NV: 75 Abs: 45) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-03-13 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Stringham): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 155-121 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 212 |
2020-03-12 | House | Special Order (Rep. Abrami): Motion Failed DV 136-169 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 31 |
2020-03-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-03-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1053h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 78 |
2020-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2020-02-12 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/18/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2020-02-12 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/18/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2020-02-05 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/13/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2020-01-29 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/05/2020 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2020-01-14 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Public Hearing: 01/28/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-12-12 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 1 P. 30 |