NH HB1654 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 195; Eff. 8/7/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 195; Eff. 8/7/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to automobile medical payments.
Title
Relative to automobile medical payments.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hunt [R] | Sen. Harold French [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 195; Eff. 8/7/2018 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Division Vote 12Y-11N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Hearing: 03/20/2018, Room 100, State House, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 13 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 13 |
2018-02-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 8 |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2018 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 18 |