NH HB1660 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Veto Sustained 09/16/2020: Regular Calendar 191-142 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Veto Sustained 09/16/2020: Regular Calendar 191-142 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a protective order for vulnerable adults.
Title
Establishing a protective order for vulnerable adults.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Polly Campion [D] | Rep. Patrick Long [D] | Rep. Lucy Weber [D] |
Rep. Paul Berch [D] | Rep. Nancy Murphy [D] | Rep. Kate Murray [D] | Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] |
Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-17 - House - Veto Override (Y: 0 N: 12 NV: 340 Abs: 36) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - OTPA (Y: 206 N: 144 NV: 21 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - OTPA (Y: 206 N: 144 NV: 21 Abs: 25) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-17 | House | Veto Sustained 09/16/2020: Regular Calendar 191-142 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote |
2020-07-29 | House | Vetoed by Governor Sununu 07/28/2020 |
2020-07-06 | House | Enrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 70 |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Special Order to 03/12/2020, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2020 Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/11/2020; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Hearing: 03/03/2020, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Introduced 02/13/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-19 | House | Referral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 46(f) 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 102 |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 62 |
2020-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0050h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 206-144 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 62 |
2020-02-19 | House | Amendment # 2020-0050h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 62 |
2020-02-12 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-02-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0050h for 02/19/2020 (Vote 12-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 22 |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/04/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2020 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-01-22 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 01/29/2020 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-12-16 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 30 |