NH HB1664 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing greenhouse gas emission reduction goals for the state and establishing a climate action plan.
Title
Establishing greenhouse gas emission reduction goals for the state and establishing a climate action plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - OTPA (Y: 197 N: 123 NV: 52 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-03 | House | Referral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 46(f) 02/20/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Executive Departments and Administration 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 83 |
2020-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0130h (NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 197-123 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 83 |
2020-02-19 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Vose): Motion Failed DV 133-194 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 83 |
2020-02-19 | House | Amendment # 2020-0130h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 83 |
2020-02-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-02-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0130h (NT) for 02/19/2020 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 25 |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-12-18 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 P. 30 |