NH HB168 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB168
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2848h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2848h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making an appropriation to the FRM victims' contribution recovery fund.
Title
Making an appropriation to the FRM victims' contribution recovery fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2848h |
2019-11-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 11/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-10-02 | House | Division I Work Session: 10/22/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2019-03-14 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-01-16 | House | Finance Division 1 Work Session: 01/23/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2019-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Finance House Journal 2 P. 40 |
Same As/Similar To
HB168 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2848h