NH HB1681 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 13-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 13-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study school meal programs in New Hampshire's public schools and non-sectarian schools that accept public funds.
Title
Establishing a committee to study school meal programs in New Hampshire's public schools and non-sectarian schools that accept public funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 13-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 9 |
2020-04-23 | House | Executive Session: 04/30/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link: https://zoom.us/j/95408968840 |
2020-03-04 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/18/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2020-02-24 | House | Division I Work Session: 03/03/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Finance 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 13 |
2020-02-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0250h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 13 |
2020-02-13 | House | Amendment # 2020-0250h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 13 |
2020-01-29 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-01-29 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0250h (NT) for 02/13/2020 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 5 |
2020-01-22 | House | Executive Session: 01/28/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 31 |