NH HB1682 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/22/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/97236261808 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/22/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/97236261808 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring schools to maintain food allergy plans to address food allergy safety and training.
Title
Requiring schools to maintain food allergy plans to address food allergy safety and training.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/22/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/97236261808 - Executive Session to Follow |
2020-03-11 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 20 |
2020-02-19 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/11/2020 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 12 |
2020-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 02/18/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/28/2020 08:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 31 |