NH HB1683 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the docking of dog tails and the cropping of dog ears.
Title
Prohibiting the docking of dog tails and the cropping of dog ears.
Sponsors
Rep. Katherine Rogers [D] | Rep. Dianne Schuett [D] | Rep. Kate Murray [D] | Rep. Kristina Schultz [D] |
Rep. Thomas Schamberg [D] | Rep. Timothy Horrigan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 11 |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 7 |
2020-01-21 | House | Executive Session: 02/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2020-01-21 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/30/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2020-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 1 P. 31 |