NH HB1684 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 88; Eff. 7/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 88; Eff. 7/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to criminal background checks for emergency medical services license applicants.
Title
Relative to criminal background checks for emergency medical services license applicants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 88; Eff. 7/24/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Hearing: 04/11/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 40 |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 22 |
2018-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 02/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/16/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-05 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2018 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 19 |