NH HB1686 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/28/2018; Chapter 341; Eff. 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/28/2018; Chapter 341; Eff. 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to applications for and the use of education tax credits.
Title
Relative to applications for and the use of education tax credits.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Hill [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. Leonard Turcotte [R] | Rep. Richard Hinch [R] |
Rep. Sean Morrison [R] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] |
Sen. Gary Daniels [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Sen. Feltes Floor Amendment 1861s (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - OTPA (Y: 168 N: 147 NV: 33 Abs: 44) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Sen. Feltes Floor Amendment 1861s (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - OTPA (Y: 168 N: 147 NV: 33 Abs: 44) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/28/2018; Chapter 341; Eff. 07/01/2018 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Floor Amendment # 2018-1861s, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/03/2018; |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Special Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19A |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Special Order to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:10 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2018 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-15 | House | Reconsider HB 1686 (Rep. Hinch): Motion Failed DV 146-171 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 57 |
2018-03-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0155h and 0831h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 168-147 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 55 |
2018-03-15 | House | FLAM # 2018-0831h (Rep. Lang): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 55 |
2018-03-15 | House | Amendment # 2018-0155h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 54 |
2018-03-08 | House | Special Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49 |
2018-03-08 | House | Suspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125 |
2018-02-27 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2018-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0155h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 13-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 66 |
2018-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2018 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-01-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/24/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 1 P. 20 |