NH HB1697 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1334
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1334
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing keno in New Hampshire.
Title
Establishing keno in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Abrami [R] | Rep. Gary Azarian [R] | Rep. Duffy Daugherty [R] | Rep. Frank Sapareto [R] |
Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1334 | |
2012-02-17 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 7 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1079 | |
2012-02-14 | House Executive Session: 2/16/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2012-01-23 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/14/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2012-01-20 | House Public Hearing: 2/9/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2012-01-18 | House Vacated from Commerce and Consumer Affairs and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 10, PG.590-591 | |
2012-01-04 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 7, PG.364 |