NH HB1697 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on August 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-02 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/01/2018; Chapter 373; Eff. 09/30/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on August 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-02 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/01/2018; Chapter 373; Eff. 09/30/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to organizations authorized to issue decals for multi-use decal plates.
Title
Relative to organizations authorized to issue decals for multi-use decal plates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-02 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 08/01/2018; Chapter 373; Eff. 09/30/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 2037c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2037c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2018-2037c; 05/17/2018 |
2018-05-11 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/15/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Birdsell, Gannon, Watters; (In Recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Gray Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-04-26 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Steven Smith, Packard, T. Walsh, Sykes 04/26/2018 House Journal 14 P. 2 |
2018-04-26 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1336s and 1422s and Requests CofC (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 House Journal 14 P. 2 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2018-1336s and 2018-1422s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Floor Amendment # 2018-1422s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1336s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Special Order to after HB 1256, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1336s, 04/12/2018; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing: 04/03/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 58 |
2018-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 33 |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2018 Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-11-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 20 |