NH HB1697 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to prescription drug discount prohibition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to prescription drug discount prohibition.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020
2020-03-11HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Sylvia) 03/11/2020
2020-03-04HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/11/2020 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 8
2020-02-20HouseExecutive Session: 03/03/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2020-02-12HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/18/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2020-01-29HousePublic Hearing: 02/05/2020 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2020-01-06HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 32

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback