NH HB1701 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the recycling of film plastics.
Title
Relative to the recycling of film plastics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - OTPA (Y: 197 N: 127 NV: 30 Abs: 42) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0974h (NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 197-127 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 143 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amendment # 2020-0974h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 143 |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0974h (NT) for 03/11/2020 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 41 |
2020-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 02/12/2020 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-01-06 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 32 |