NH HB1706 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study the solid waste practices of state agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study the solid waste practices of state agencies.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-16SenateVacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
2020-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 7
2020-02-19HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 14
2020-02-12HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/19/2020 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 9
2020-01-29HouseExecutive Session: 02/05/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2020-01-22HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306
2020-01-06HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 32

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback