NH HB1707 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-20 - Executive Session: 10/16/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building205
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-20 - Executive Session: 10/16/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building205
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to information regarding abortion.
Title
Relative to information regarding abortion.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-20 | House | Executive Session: 10/16/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building205 |
2018-03-21 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 5 |
2018-03-16 | House | Suspend House Rule 65; extending deadline for action to 3/22/2018 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 69 |
2018-03-08 | House | Special Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49 |
2018-03-08 | House | Suspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125 |
2018-02-23 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2018-02-23 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/06/2018 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 69 |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-11-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 20 |