NH HB1707 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expanding the family-centered early supports and services (FCESS) program to children under the age of 3 who are born substance-exposed.
Title
Expanding the family-centered early supports and services (FCESS) program to children under the age of 3 who are born substance-exposed.
Sponsors
Rep. Joelle Martin [D] | Rep. Mary Wallner [D] | Rep. Stephen Shurtleff [D] | Rep. Karen Ebel [D] |
Rep. Skip Berrien [D] | Rep. Mary Mulligan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0447h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 66 |
2020-02-19 | House | Amendment # 2020-0447h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 66 |
2020-02-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0447h for 02/19/2020 (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 23 |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/04/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2020-01-22 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/30/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-01-09 | House | ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/22/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-01-06 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 32 |