NH HB1708 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1018h (Vote 14-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1018h (Vote 14-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to certain liquor license fees and establishing 2 liquor investigator positions.
Title
Relative to certain liquor license fees and establishing 2 liquor investigator positions.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Almy [D] | Rep. Joelle Martin [D] | Rep. Norman Major [R] | Rep. Patrick Abrami [R] |
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1018h (Vote 14-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 9 |
2020-05-14 | House | Executive Session: 05/21/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: https://www.zoom.us/j/91769986281 |
2020-03-04 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/18/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2020-02-26 | House | Division I Work Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Finance 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 91 |
2020-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 91 |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/19/2020 (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 26 |
2020-01-22 | House | Executive Session: 02/04/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2020-01-06 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 1 P. 32 |