NH HB1714 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to chemical analysis of fish in stocked waterways.
Title
Relative to chemical analysis of fish in stocked waterways.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 6 |
2018-01-29 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/07/2018 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 9 |
2018-01-11 | House | Executive Session: 01/23/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2017-11-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources House Journal 1 P. 21 |