NH HB1716 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the treatment of veterans' disability benefits for purposes of determining child support.
Title
Relative to the treatment of veterans' disability benefits for purposes of determining child support.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2020-06-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 7 |
2020-05-31 | House | Executive Session: 06/02/2020 03:00 pm Pursuant to House Rule 43(b) an executive session may be held following hearing |
2020-05-28 | House | Public Hearing: 06/02/2020 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: https://www.zoom.us/j/99085894301 |
2020-03-10 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/17/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2020-03-10 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 03/17/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2020-03-05 | House | Suspend House Rule to extend reporting deadline (Reps. Ley, Hinch): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 1 |
2020-03-05 | House | Introduced 03/05/2020 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 6 P. 1 |
2020-03-05 | House | Late Drafting and Introduction Approved by Rules Committee 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 1 |