NH HB1720 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 199; Eff. 8/7/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 199; Eff. 8/7/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the storage of beverages produced by contract brewers.
Title
Relative to the storage of beverages produced by contract brewers.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hunt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 199; Eff. 8/7/2018 |
2018-05-09 | House | Enrolled 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/03/2018); Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1797e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1797e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing: 04/03/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0764h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 19 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0764h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 19 |
2018-02-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0764h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 10 |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2018 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/23/2018 11:35 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 02:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-11-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 21 |