NH HB1727 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 54
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 54
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to monitoring perflourinated chemicals in public water supplies.
Title
Relative to monitoring perflourinated chemicals in public water supplies.
Sponsors
Rep. Mindi Messmer [D] | Rep. James McConnell [R] | Rep. Michael Edgar [D] | Rep. Valerie Fraser [R] |
Rep. Tamara Le [D] | Rep. Rebecca Mcbeath [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 54 |
2018-02-21 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 31 |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2018 Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 1 P. 21 |