NH HB1730 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a public safety enhancement revolving fund, establishing a grant program for body cameras worn by police, and creating prestige number vanity plates.
Title
Establishing a public safety enhancement revolving fund, establishing a grant program for body cameras worn by police, and creating prestige number vanity plates.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. David Welch [R] | Rep. Richard O'Leary [D] | Rep. James McConnell [R] |
Rep. Linn Opderbecke [D] | Rep. Delmar Burridge [D] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 25 |
2018-01-23 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/07/2018 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 21 |
2018-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 01/16/2018 Legislative Office Building 204 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 10:20 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 21 |