NH HB1735 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the use of funds in the drug forfeiture fund.
Title
Relative to the use of funds in the drug forfeiture fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 8 |
2018-01-31 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/07/2018 (Vote 14-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 10 |
2018-01-11 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2018-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 21 |