NH HB1736 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall HB 1736 Become Law: Regular Calendar 12Y-12N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/13/2018; Senate Journal 19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall HB 1736 Become Law: Regular Calendar 12Y-12N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/13/2018; Senate Journal 19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to increasing the threshold required for governor and council approval of expenditures from the dam maintenance fund.
Title
Relative to increasing the threshold required for governor and council approval of expenditures from the dam maintenance fund.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mullen [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-09-13 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-09-13 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-09-13 - House - Veto Override (Y: 266 N: 79 NV: 17 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-09-13 - House - Veto Override (Y: 266 N: 79 NV: 17 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Senate | Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall HB 1736 Become Law: Regular Calendar 12Y-12N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/13/2018; Senate Journal 19 |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Sen. Hennessey Moved Reconsideration on HB 1736, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 09/13/2018; Senate Journal 19 |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall HB 1736 Become Law: Regular Calendar 11Y-13N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/13/2018; Senate Journal 19 |
2018-09-13 | House | Veto Overridden 09/13/2018: Regular Calendar 266-79 by Required Two-Thirds Vote |
2018-05-31 | House | Vetoed by Governor Sununu 05/29/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/12/2018; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing: 04/03/2018, Room 103, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0222h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 43 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0222h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 43 |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0222h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 24-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 25 |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-01-17 | House | Division I Work Session: 01/23/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-01-11 | House | Division I Work Session: 01/17/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Finance House Journal 1 P. 21 |