NH HB1745 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making appropriations for costs involved in controlling invasive aquatic species.
Title
Making appropriations for costs involved in controlling invasive aquatic species.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 4 |
2018-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/21/2018 (Vote 24-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 4 |
2018-03-02 | House | Executive Session: 03/14/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-02-22 | House | Division I Work Session: 02/27/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Finance 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 78 |
2018-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 78 |
2018-01-31 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/07/2018 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar) |
2018-01-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/24/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-01-11 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-11-20 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 1 P. 22 |