NH HB1761 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 305; Eff. 6/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 305; Eff. 6/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the math learning communities program in secondary schools.
Title
Relative to the math learning communities program in secondary schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] | Rep. Dan Wolf [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Senate - Sen. Giuda Floor Amendment 1644s (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 305; Eff. 6/25/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 2042c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2042c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2018-2042c; 05/17/2018 |
2018-05-11 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/16/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Reagan, Ward, Watters; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Reagan Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. T. Wolf, Ladd, D. Wolf, Myler 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1456s and 1644s and Requests CofC (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2018-1456s and 2018-1644s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Floor Amendment # 2018-1644s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Amendment Adopted; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Without Objection, Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment # 2018-1456s; 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Chair Ruled Sections of Amendment # 2018-1456s Non-Germane, 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1456s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1456s, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing: 04/03/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 29 |
2018-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 14 |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/14/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-11-21 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 22 |